MD HB200 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State Budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2024)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Floor Amendment 783020/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (Y: 13 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Floor Amendment 783822/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 303728/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 95 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 883425/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 36 N: 94 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 283325/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 92 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 973121/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 90 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 603028/1 (Delegate Munoz) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Committee Amendment (#107) Adopted (Y: 99 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Floor Amendment 783020/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (Y: 13 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Floor Amendment 783822/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 303728/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 95 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 883425/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 36 N: 94 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 283325/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 92 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 973121/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 90 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 603028/1 (Delegate Munoz) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Committee Amendment (#107) Adopted (Y: 99 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101 |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-4) |
2023-04-03 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-03-28 | House | Senate advisors: (Senators Elfreth, Jackson and Zucker) |
2023-03-28 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, Rosapepe, McCray, King and Corderman) |
2023-03-28 | House | Senate Refuses Recede |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate advisors: (Senators Elfreth, Jackson and Zucker) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, Rosapepe, McCray, King and Corderman) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2023-03-27 | Senate | House advisors: (Delegates Shetty, J. Lewis and Bridges) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates B. Barnes, Chang, Smith, Ghrist and Korman) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2023-03-27 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2023-03-27 | House | House advisors: (Delegates Shetty, J. Lewis and Bridges) |
2023-03-27 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates B. Barnes, Chang, Smith, Ghrist and Korman) |
2023-03-27 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2023-03-27 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment {783020/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-33) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment {783822/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (14-33) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment {983729/1 Adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#33-38) Adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#27-32) Adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#21-26) Adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#12-20) Adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#7-11) Adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#1-6) Adopted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-5) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {303728/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (35-95) |
2023-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {883425/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (36-94) |
2023-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {283325/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (37-92) |
2023-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {973121/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (42-90) |
2023-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {603028/1 (Delegate Munoz) Rejected (43-89) |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#108-127) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#107) Adopted (99-33) |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#105-106) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#105-127) |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#89-104) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#71-88) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#60-70) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#29-59) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#18-28) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#12-17) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#11) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#10) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#9) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#9-17) |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Amendment (#1-8) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2023-03-13 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-01-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB181 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-20 - First Reading Budget and Taxation