MD HB199 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decreasing the State corporate income tax rate by .45% each year for 5 years, from 8.25% to 6%.
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |