MD HB199 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that under specified circumstances a homeowner who is an employee of the federal government stationed outside the State may qualify for the homestead property tax credit for a dwelling even though the homeowner does not live in the dwelling for the required period of time.
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Eligibility of Employees of the Federal
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. Steven DeBoy [D] |
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Del. Patrick McDonough [R] | Del. Shane Pendergrass [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-28 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Ways and Means |