MD HB198 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a basket of cheer permit in Wicomico County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to grant the permit to certain nonprofit organizations; providing that the permit authorizes the permit holder to provide as a prize at a benefit performance a basket of cheer, consisting of certain alcoholic beverages; specifying that the alcoholic beverages contained in a basket of cheer shall be for off-premises consumption; and setting a fee of $30 or $45 for the permit for holders of certain Class C Licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback