MD HB197 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State to reimburse a county board for certain payments on a certain application for reimbursement; requiring a county board to pay up to $300 towards the exam fee for a student who takes a certain exam; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - State Reimbursement for County Board Payments for Exams for Eligible Students

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-2)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {975468/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-18HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback