MD HB193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting an individual from the requirement to not be subject to compulsory school attendance and to have withdrawn from school in order to be eligible to obtain a high school diploma by examination if the individual participates in a GED Option Program administered by the State Department of Education that creates a pathway to a high school diploma by examination for certain currently enrolled high school English language learner students under the age of 21 years.
Title
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374 |
2018-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Rey) Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Exemptions
Language
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Exemptions
Language
Minors
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students