MD HB192 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and periodically update certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing State buildings in a certain manner; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to include certain standards in any requirements that the Council establishes for participation in a higher performance building program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (99-38)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {356480/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-01-22HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2020-01-22HouseHearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2020-01-16HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB299 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement4101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement4410.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback