MD HB191 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an addition modification under the Maryland income tax for the amount of certain trade or business expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year that are deducted under the Internal Revenue Code for the payment of certain fines, penalties, or other amounts; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022.
Title
Income Tax - Payments of Fines, Penalties, and Other Amounts - Addition Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Substitute Committee Amendment {423124/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion to Withdraw Committee Amendments (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {303023/1 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {303023/1 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {303023/1 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-39) |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-19 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |