MD HB190 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Public Works to approve the award of a procurement contract for specialized printing services before a unit may execute the contract; prohibiting the Board from delegating its authority to approve the award of a procurement contract for specialized printing services; and defining "specialized printing services" as services valued at $100,000 or more for the printing of a ballot or a document that contains sensitive or personally identifiable information.
Title
Procurement – Specialized Printing Services Contracts – Board of Public Works Approval
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {266280/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-09-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB190 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB157 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
SB157 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |