MD HB190 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the notice that specified mammography centers are required to include in a specified screening results letter; and requiring the notice to state that together, a patient and the patient's physician can decide whether additional screening options might be right for the patient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mammography Centers - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification of Breast Cancer Screening Options

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220
2017-03-31HouseReturned Passed
2017-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-27SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-02-24HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-02-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {886789/1 Report Adopted
2017-02-21HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-02-09HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-19HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0190&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0190f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0190t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_220_hb0190t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0190_88678901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0190.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0190_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0190_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0190,h-0183&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0190,s-0973&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback