MD HB185 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an alcoholic beverages license holder or an employee of a license holder from requiring, as a condition of sale of an alcoholic beverage for on-premises consumption, that an individual buy more than one bottle, container, or other serving at a time; and establishing certain penalties for a violation of the Act.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sales - Required Multiple Purchases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-06-26 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Counties
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Counties
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Retail Sales