MD HB184 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Office of the Inspector General in the Prince George's County public school system to provide independent evaluation and recommendations to improve the effectiveness, productivity, or efficiency of local school system programs, policies, practices and operations; requiring the Prince George's County Council to appoint the Inspector General; requiring the Inspector General to coordinate with the Prince George's County public school system to develop a certain work plan and establish certain goals and priorities; etc.
Title
Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment PG 508-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {383722/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-82) (Y: 48 N: 83 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {383722/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-82) (Y: 48 N: 83 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment {383722/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-82) |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {485966/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
County Councils
Education - Local Bills
Electronic Communication
Fraud
Inspections
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Privacy
Public Schools
Publications
Reports
School Administration
Work, Labor and Employment
Education - Local Bills
Electronic Communication
Fraud
Inspections
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Privacy
Public Schools
Publications
Reports
School Administration
Work, Labor and Employment