MD HB1824 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Director of Finance of Prince George's County to distribute the proceeds from the additional marriage license fee to battered spouse shelters and domestic violence programs in accordance with the criteria and procedures established by the Prince George's County Department of Social Services.
Title
Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 433-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Walker) Adopted (119-4) (Y: 120 N: 5 NV: 16 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2018-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-30 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Walker) Adopted (119-4) |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Abuse
Counties - Local Laws
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Fees
Housing
Licenses
Marriage
Prince George's County
Social Services
Spouses
Counties - Local Laws
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Fees
Housing
Licenses
Marriage
Prince George's County
Social Services
Spouses