MD HB1819 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Cyber Warrior Diversity Program at Baltimore City Community College, Bowie State University, Coppin State University, Morgan State University, and the University of Maryland Eastern Shore to train students in computer networking and cybersecurity; requiring the Governor for fiscal year 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter to include in the annual State operating budget an appropriation of $2,500,000 for the Maryland Higher Education Commission to provide grants to certain institutions in the State for the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566
2018-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-09SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-09SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {134768/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-30HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2018-03-08HouseReferred House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-08HouseMotion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (135-1)
2018-03-08HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback