MD HB181 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the State song; establishing the State Song Advisory Panel; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Advisory Panel; requiring the Advisory Panel to review certain submissions and suggestions for a new State song and to hold at least three public hearings; requiring the Advisory Panel to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2020; terminating a certain provision of the Act after June 30, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions - State Song - Advisory Panel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-17HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions7318(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback