MD HB181 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering prohibited actions relating to electronic harassment of minors; prohibiting a person from maliciously engaging in an electronic communication if the electronic communication, as part of a series of communications, has the effect of intimidating or harassing a minor and causing physical injury or serious emotional distress to a minor and the person engaging in the electronic communication acts with a certain intent; prohibiting a person from violating the Act with the intent to induce a minor to commit suicide; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 27
2019-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {732611/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback