MD HB181 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering prohibited actions relating to electronic harassment of minors; prohibiting a person from maliciously engaging in an electronic communication if the electronic communication, as part of a series of communications, has the effect of intimidating or harassing a minor and causing physical injury or serious emotional distress to a minor and the person engaging in the electronic communication acts with a certain intent; prohibiting a person from violating the Act with the intent to induce a minor to commit suicide; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27 |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {732611/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Electronic Communication
Harassment
internet
Libel and Slander
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Pornography
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Electronic Communication
Harassment
internet
Libel and Slander
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Pornography
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology