MD HB181 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Department of the Environment, to conduct a specified study on the feasibility of establishing a biomonitoring program in the State; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to make a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2011; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biomonitoring Program - Report
Sponsors
Del. Saqib Ali [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. Eric Bromwell [D] |
Del. William Bronrott [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. James Hubbard [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Reports
Sunset