MD HB180 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending from September 30, 2022, to June 30, 2030, the termination date of the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact and other provisions of law related to the Compact; and requiring the State Board of Physicians to include an update on the status of the Compact in its 2023 annual report.
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact – Sunset Extension and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 46-0 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 46-0 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {723127/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-09-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB386 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Physicians
Reports
Sunset
Communications
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Physicians
Reports
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |