MD HB180 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB272

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a certain mitigating factor in a certain juvenile court proceeding against a child for a certain violation if the violation involved or arose out of sexting; requiring and authorizing the juvenile court to take certain actions in making a certain disposition on a certain finding; prohibiting the juvenile court from taking certain actions in making a certain disposition on a certain finding; establishing a certain affirmative defense under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles - Sexting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-23HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-10-12HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB272 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings38A-19(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings38A-35(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law11203(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law11207(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law11208(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback