MD HB180 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue electronic credentials in addition to, and not instead of, a license or an identification card; defining an "electronic credential" as an electronic representation of a license, an identification card, or a data field; establishing that a credential holder satisfies certain license display requirements; authorizing the Administration to create an electronic credential; authorizing an alcoholic beverages license holder to accept an electronic credential as proof of age; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 142
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {860410/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback