MD HB1795 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the purposes of the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Fund; providing that certain funds may be used only for the purposes of the State Reinsurance Program; requiring, rather than authorizing, the Exchange, in consultation with the Maryland Insurance Commission and as approved by the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Board, to establish and implement a State Reinsurance Program to provide reinsurance to certain carriers; requiring that the Program be designed to mitigate the impact of certain individuals on rates; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-4) (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6
2018-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-23SenateThird Reading Passed (43-4)
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {583825/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {906685/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-05HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2018-03-02HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1795&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1795f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1795t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_6_hb1795t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb1795_58382501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb1795_90668501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb1795.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1795_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0485.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1795_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0778.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback