MD HB1788 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Appointments Office in the Office of the Governor to submit a certain report by December 31, 2018, regarding certain activities of the Office to the Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight of the General Assembly; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Title
State Government – Appointments Office in the Office of the Governor – Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-48) (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/9 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (50-87) (Y: 51 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/9 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (50-87) (Y: 51 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-48) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (50-87) |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {314665/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Ethics
Public Employees
Public Officials
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Discrimination
Ethics
Public Employees
Public Officials
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment