MD HB1786 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship Program; establishing eligibility criteria that require an individual to be a member of the Reserve Officer Training Corps, a certain minority student, and a student at a historically black college or university in the State; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to award 25% of its grant money to students at Bowie State University and 75% to certain other colleges and universities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09SenateFloor Amendment {753424/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-09SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-06SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {915667/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-30HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2018-03-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback