MD HB1774 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Task Force to Study the Effectiveness of the Enforcement of Restrictions on the Possession of Regulated Firearms; providing for the membership, staffing, and duties of the Task Force; requiring the Governor to appoint the chair of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding whether existing laws are effective and adequately serve the public and report to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2018; terminating the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study the Effectiveness of the Enforcement of Restrictions on the Possession of Regulated Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
2018-03-13HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-14HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2018-02-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback