MD HB1773 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $75,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Pocomoke Little League, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of field lights for the Pocomoke Little League baseball field, located in Worcester County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Pocomoke Little League

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-03-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
2018-03-02HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2018-02-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback