MD HB1772 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include in the State budget for fiscal years 2020 through 2023, an appropriation of $500,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund for the operation of the replica sailing vessel known as the Pride of Baltimore II; requiring a person or entity receiving funds under the Act to submit a report to the Department of Transportation and certain committees of the General Assembly on the expenditure of funds and on information demonstrating that the Pride was operated solely for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-22) (Y: 114 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-04-06 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-22) |
2018-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {484361/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-02-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Contracts
Disclosure
Grants
Historical Matters
Operating Budget
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Tourism
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Contracts
Disclosure
Grants
Historical Matters
Operating Budget
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Tourism
Transportation
Transportation - Generally