MD HB177 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the 9-1-1 Registry Program to authorize self-advocates, parents, or guardians of individuals with autism or other special needs to register with the 9-1-1 system in order to alert first responders of certain behaviors individuals with autism or other special needs may exhibit during encounters with first responders; and requiring each public safety answering point to establish certain procedures, ensure the details of Program are publicly available, and maintain accurate information on registered individuals.
Title
9-1-1 Registry Program - Autism and Other Special Needs - Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-14 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-09-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Autism Spectrum
Developmental Disabilities
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Registration
Developmental Disabilities
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 1 | 304.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |