MD HB1760 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "veteran" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing veteran-owned small business enterprise participation in procurement to include only individuals who are verified by the State Department of Veterans Affairs as having served on active duty in the armed forces of the United States, other than for training, and were discharged or released under conditions other than dishonorable; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2018-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {406787/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-15HouseHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-05HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2018-02-22HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback