MD HB176 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring candidates nominated by a new political party to file a certificate of candidacy not later than 5 p.m. on the first Monday in August in the year of the general election for the office, comply with certain requirements for a certificate of candidacy, and file a certificate of nomination with the appropriate board on a certain form; providing that a candidate nominated by a new political party under certain provisions of law is not required to file a declaration of intent; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Candidates – Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (141-0)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {505762/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback