MD HB176 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the conduct of a special election to fill a vacancy for an elected member on the Montgomery County Board of Education under specified circumstances; altering the authority of the members of the county board to appoint an individual to fill a vacancy for an elected member on the county board; providing that, under specified circumstances, the special election be held concurrently with a specified previously scheduled election in the county; etc.
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 22-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {435761/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
County Executives
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Federal Government
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Notices
Postal Service
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Federal Government
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Notices
Postal Service