MD HB1754 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing Baltimore County annually to spend, from the fines collected as a result of violations enforced by speed monitoring systems in school zones, up to $5,000 per public high school for after-prom parties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-21HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-05HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2018-02-21HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback