MD HB1754 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Baltimore County annually to spend, from the fines collected as a result of violations enforced by speed monitoring systems in school zones, up to $5,000 per public high school for after-prom parties.
Title
Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-05 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Counties - Local Laws
Fines
Photography
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Counties - Local Laws
Fines
Photography
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally