MD HB1753 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program to award scholarships to HBCU students so that they may explore State government career opportunities through government internships; establishing the HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Committee; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to administer the Program, subject to a certain scholarship committee; etc.
Title
HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Apprentices
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
Students
Tuition
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
Students
Tuition