MD HB174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain provision of law to require absent uniformed services voters and overseas voters as defined in the federal Uniformed and Overseas Citizens Absentee Voting Act and voters with a disability who do not have a Maryland driver's license or Maryland identification card and who use an online absentee ballot application or another Internet method to request an absentee ballot to provide the last four digits of the applicant's Social Security number, rather than the full Social Security number.
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-02-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Ballots
Cybersecurity
Data
Disabilities
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Identification
internet
Privacy
Voting
Ballots
Cybersecurity
Data
Disabilities
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Identification
internet
Privacy
Voting