MD HB1729 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to provide sufficient funds in the budget to ensure that the value of temporary cash assistance, combined with federal food stamps, is equal to at least certain percentages of the State minimum living level for certain fiscal years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2018-02-19HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback