MD HB1723 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an inmate participating in a work-release arrangement in Charles County to pay court-ordered restitution and certain food, lodging, electronic monitoring, and clothing costs; requiring the Charles County Sheriff to establish certain per diem rates and designate an agent to collect the costs; and requiring the Sheriff's designee to deliver certain amounts collected to the county treasurer.
Title
Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625 |
2018-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {802519/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-02-19 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Charles County
Counties - Local Laws
Prisoners
Restitution
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment
Charles County
Counties - Local Laws
Prisoners
Restitution
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment