MD HB1721 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the amount available for a purse for the Maryland International thoroughbred race by specifying the amount is up to $500,000; specifying that the Maryland International is a graded stakes race; authorizing the Maryland International to continue to be conducted after June 30, 2019; requiring that certain money distributed to the Racing Special Fund and paid for certain purposes remain available for those purposes and may not be used for any other purpose; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 184
2018-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2018-02-19HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback