MD HB1697 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to limit the uses of certain revenues to educational opportunities and programs for the children of the State in public schools, the advancement of educators, and the construction of school facilities; requiring the Governor to include in the budget submission certain amounts in certain fiscal years as supplemental funding for certain purposes; requiring that certain funding be in addition to certain State funding provided for certain grades in public schools; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional Amendment

Sponsors

Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]
Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]
Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Tony Knotts [D]
Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]
Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]
Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]
Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]
Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]
Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]
Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]
Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]Del. Mary Washington [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-04-09SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2018-04-09SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (134-2)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {144563/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2018-02-26HouseRereferred to Appropriations and Ways and Means
2018-02-15HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback