MD HB1685 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund to make grants to counties and municipalities to provide care coordination services to low-income pregnant and postpartum women and to children from birth to 3 years old; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget $50,000 for the Fund beginning in fiscal year 2020; authorizing any county or municipality to apply for a grant; requiring that a grant application include certain evidence and a data collection plan; etc.
Title
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {726384/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Children
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counties
Grants
Health
Health, Department of
Interest
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Pregnancy
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Women
Budgets
Children
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counties
Grants
Health
Health, Department of
Interest
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Pregnancy
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Treasurers
Women