MD HB1682 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Collaborative Care Pilot Program in the Maryland Department of Health to implement a Collaborative Care Model in primary care settings to provide health care services to recipients enrolled in HealthChoice; requiring the Department to select up to three sites for the Pilot Program; requiring the Department to work with stakeholders on the development, implementation, and outcome monitoring of the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget $550,000 for certain fiscal years; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Collaborative Care Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {646781/2 Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Governor
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Records
Work, Labor and Employment
Budgets
Governor
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Records
Work, Labor and Employment