MD HB1675 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of CASA de Maryland, Inc. and the County Executive and County Council of Montgomery County for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the Rockville Welcome Center facility, located in Montgomery County; providing for the disbursement of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
County Councils
County Executives
Montgomery County
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Tourism
County Councils
County Executives
Montgomery County
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Tourism