MD HB1669 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Walker)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Walker)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the governing body of Baltimore County to grant a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by a homeowner who is at least 70 years old under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of, eligibility for, and application of the credit; providing that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation is responsible for certain administrative duties with respect to the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 70 Years Old
Sponsors
Del. Jay Jalisi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Walker) |
2018-03-17 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {645461/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore County
Elderly Persons
Local Government Mandates
Property Tax
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Baltimore County
Elderly Persons
Local Government Mandates
Property Tax
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local