MD HB1663 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Governor to take certain actions as a result of the issuance by the Governor on March 5, 2020, of the proclamation declaring a state of emergency for the duration of a certain emergency; providing that a certain violation is subject to certain provisions of law under certain circumstances; providing that a certain alternative workweek may allow an employee to work certain hours or shifts; requiring that an employee authorized to work an alternative workweek is considered a full-time employee; etc.
Title
State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits
(COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14 |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {327771/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {183228/1 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Cullison) Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {606981/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Cullison) Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {116484/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Cullison) Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {316586/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-09 | House | Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (133-0) |
2020-03-09 | House | Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (133-0) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1080 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Diseases
Drugs
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Energy Matters
Equipment
Ethics
Food
Fuel
Governor
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Immunization
Insurance Administration
Interstate Affairs
Laboratories
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients
Prices
Public Health
Public Safety
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Storage
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unfair Trade Practices
Water
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Consumer Protection
Diseases
Drugs
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Energy Matters
Equipment
Ethics
Food
Fuel
Governor
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Immunization
Insurance Administration
Interstate Affairs
Laboratories
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients
Prices
Public Health
Public Safety
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Storage
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unfair Trade Practices
Water
Work, Labor and Employment