MD HB1661 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing the Governor to transfer by budget amendment up to $50,000,000 from the Revenue Stabilization Account to fund costs associated with the Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19); requiring the Governor to provide the Legislative Policy Committee with at least 7 days for review before transferring funds; requiring, within 60 days of the release of funds, the Department of Budget and Management to submit a report to the Legislative Policy Committee and the General Assembly on the use of the funds per unit of State government; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2020-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {504266/1 Adopted
2020-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-03-05HouseHearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-03-05HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-05HouseMotion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
2020-03-05HouseMotion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
2020-03-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB1079 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback