MD HB1660 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to include in an assessment record for real property a note describing any reduction in an assessment resulting from a certain order or decision and, under certain circumstances, the specific reason for the reduction; applying certain provisions of law that relate to the authority of the Department during a reassessment of property after an appeal to certain appeals filed with a supervisor of assessments on or after October 1, 2014, but still pending a final decision; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax – Assessment Records of Real Property and Reassessment After Appeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 650
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {265461/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback