MD HB166 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying the State minimum wage rate that is in effect for certain time periods and for certain employers except under certain circumstances; authorizing the Board of Public Works to temporarily suspend an increase to the minimum wage rate if the seasonally adjusted total employment is negative, subject to certain limitations; requiring the Governor's proposed budget for certain fiscal years to include certain rate increases for certain community service providers over the funding provided in certain legislative appropriations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)

Sponsors

Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Sandy Bartlett [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]Del. Nick Charles [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]
Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Debra Davis [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]
Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]
Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Julian Ivey [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]
Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Ken Kerr [D]
Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]
Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Lesley Lopez [D]Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]
Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]
Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Mike Rogers [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Jared Solomon [D]
Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Melissa Wells [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House Floor - Overridden (96-43) (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Conference Committee Report {933023/1 Adopted (32-13) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-41) (Y: 94 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-44) (Y: 97 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {223723/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (44-97) (Y: 45 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {583421/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (47-94) (Y: 48 N: 95 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {893924/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (43-98) (Y: 44 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {673621/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (45-95) (Y: 46 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {563425/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (42-99) (Y: 43 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 10
2019-03-28SenateVeto overridden (32-15)
2019-03-28HouseVeto overridden (96-43)
2019-03-27HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2019-03-20HousePassed Enrolled
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (32-13)
2019-03-20SenateConference Committee Report Adopted (32-13)
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (93-41)
2019-03-20HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateSenators Kelley, Feldman, and Augustine
2019-03-18SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-03-18SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2019-03-15HouseDelegates D.E. Davis, Wilson, and Dumais
2019-03-15HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-03-15HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-03-15HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (32-15)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {697470/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateSpecial Order until 3/13 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {697470/1
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (96-44)
2019-03-01HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Gilchrist) Rejected
2019-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-27HouseFloor Amendment {563425/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (42-99)
2019-02-27HouseFloor Amendment {673621/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (45-95)
2019-02-27HouseFloor Amendment {893924/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (43-98)
2019-02-27HouseFloor Amendment {583421/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (47-94)
2019-02-27HouseFloor Amendment {223723/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (44-97)
2019-02-27HouseFloor Committee Amendment {423696/1 Adopted
2019-02-26HouseSpecial Order until 02/27 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {243596/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-25HouseHearing 2/08 at 12:30 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0166&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0166f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0166t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0166e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_10_hb0166e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_24359601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_22372301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_42369601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_56342501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_58342101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_67362101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_89392401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_69747001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_63362301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_93302301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0166.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0166_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0211.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0212.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0213.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0214.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0215.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0260.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0166_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0562.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0166_93302301.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0702.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0703.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0871.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/veto_letters/hb0166.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0969.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback