MD HB1659 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program to provide grants from the Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund to bring new youth and amateur events to the State and attract sports fans, participants, and tourists; requiring Maryland Sports to implement and administer the Program in a certain manner; requiring the Comptroller to distribute a certain amount of money from the State Lottery Fund to the Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund each fiscal year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-16SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (130-3)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {804063/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-03-04HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-03HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-03HouseMotion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
2020-03-03HouseMotion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
2020-03-03HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB1076 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-28 - First Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation11403(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10601(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10612.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10612.2(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9120(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback