MD HB1659 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program to provide grants from the Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund to bring new youth and amateur events to the State and attract sports fans, participants, and tourists; requiring Maryland Sports to implement and administer the Program in a certain manner; requiring the Comptroller to distribute a certain amount of money from the State Lottery Fund to the Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund each fiscal year; etc.
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {804063/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1076 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-28 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Advertising
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Gender
Grants
Lottery
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Tourism
Youth
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Gender
Grants
Lottery
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Tourism
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 11 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 612.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 612.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |