MD HB1658 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to appropriate certain amounts of money to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in fiscal years 2022 through 2026; requiring the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra to submit certain reports to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before October 15 each year, beginning in 2022 and for the next 4 years; and repealing the termination of a certain provision of law requiring the Governor to appropriate a certain amount of money to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in fiscal years 2020 and 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development - Baltimore Symphony Orchestra - Funding and Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 108 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 110 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (106-27)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {574167/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-03-04HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-03HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-03HouseMotion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (108-29)
2020-03-03HouseMotion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (110-25)
2020-03-03HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB1065 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2019(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development4513(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback